TN HB2452 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the manufacturer of a nonconforming HVAC system to repair the system at no cost to the consumer; requires replacement of the HVAC system in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 62 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the manufacturer of a nonconforming HVAC system to repair the system at no cost to the consumer; requires replacement of the HVAC system in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 62 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/14/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
2018-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2018-02-05HouseP1C.
2018-02-01HouseIntro.
2018-02-01HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2558 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback