TN HB2442 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes changes related to a caterer's license for purposes of consumption on the premises; restricts the number of undercover investigations the alcoholic beverage commission can perform on a single licensee in a year; requires a server permit for a doorperson employed at an establishment that sells liquor-by-the-drink; makes certain other alcohol sales revisions. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 57.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes changes related to a caterer's license for purposes of consumption on the premises; restricts the number of undercover investigations the alcoholic beverage commission can perform on a single licensee in a year; requires a server permit for a doorperson employed at an establishment that sells liquor-by-the-drink; makes certain other alcohol sales revisions. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 57.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27HouseTaken off notice for cal. in State Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseAction def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Committee
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2020-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2020-02-05HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2481 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback