TN HB2442 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 841
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires a person seeking to own a bonding company have two years of experience writing bail as a full-time agent with a professional bonding company in good standing. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires a person seeking to own a bonding company have two years of experience writing bail as a full-time agent with a professional bonding company in good standing. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11, Part 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-03 Pub. Ch. 841
2012-05-03 Effective date(s) 04/27/12
2012-04-27 Signed by Governor.
2012-04-18 Transmitted to Governor for his action.
2012-04-18 Signed by S. Speaker
2012-04-16 Signed by H. Speaker
2012-04-12 Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2012-04-12 Passed S., Ayes 24, Nays 5
2012-04-12 S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
2012-03-15 Rcvd. from H., P1C.
2012-03-12 Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2012-03-12 Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0
2012-03-08 H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2012
2012-03-07 Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2012
2012-02-28 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2012-02-22 Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 2/28/2012
2012-02-22 Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
2012-02-15 Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 2/22/2012
2012-01-24 Assigned to s/c Judiciary Subcommittee
2012-01-13 P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee
2012-01-12 Intro., P1C.
2012-01-11 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2720 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 841

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback