TN HB2442 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Failed In s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Equal and Fair Parenting Act" to create a rebuttable presumption that equally shared parenting is the custody arrangement in the best interest of a child. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Equal and Fair Parenting Act" to create a rebuttable presumption that equally shared parenting is the custody arrangement in the best interest of a child. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-30 Failed In s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA of Children and Family Affairs Committee
2010-03-24 Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 03/30/2010
2010-03-23 Action Def. in s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA to 3/30/2010
2010-03-17 Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 03/23/2010
2010-03-16 Action Def. in s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA to 3/23/2010
2010-03-10 Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 03/16/2010
2010-01-27 Assigned to s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA
2010-01-25 P2C, ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee
2010-01-12 Intro., P1C.
2009-12-10 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB3443 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-01 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback