TN HB2440 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds certain violent juvenile sexual offenders to the Tennessee Sexual Offender and Violent Sexual Offender Registration, Verification and Tracking Act. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39.
Title
As introduced, adds certain violent juvenile sexual offenders to the Tennessee Sexual Offender and Violent Sexual Offender Registration, Verification and Tracking Act. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 02/03/2010 | |
2010-01-26 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-01-25 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-12-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2393 (Crossfiled) 2010-01-25 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2440&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2440.pdf |