TN HB2437 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from the first day of the general assembly's organizational session to January 1, the date by which the commissioner shall annually report to the general assembly on the commissioner's work and the work of the state board of equalization, and shall make recommendations as the commissioner deems best for the interest of the state. - Amends TCA Title 5 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, changes from the first day of the general assembly's organizational session to January 1, the date by which the commissioner shall annually report to the general assembly on the commissioner's work and the work of the state board of equalization, and shall make recommendations as the commissioner deems best for the interest of the state. - Amends TCA Title 5 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2379 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee