TN HB2434 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, on or after July 1, 2022, redefines "bed and breakfast establishment" to include a single condominium for purposes of the Bed and Breakfast Establishment Inspection Act of 1990. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 56; Title 62; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 56; Title 62; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to the rental of property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/12/2022 |
2022-04-05 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/12/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Action def. in Commerce Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2022-02-23 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee -- Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2850 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-14 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.