TN HB2434 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 739
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 739
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes requirements for issuance of diplomas, certificates of credit, and transcripts when a student has outstanding debts or obligations owed to a college or university. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Section 49-9-108.
Title
As enacted, establishes requirements for issuance of diplomas, certificates of credit, and transcripts when a student has outstanding debts or obligations owed to a college or university. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Section 49-9-108.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 739 | |
2018-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2174 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 739