TN HB2424 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 899
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 899
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the penalty for mitigated criminal littering from a Class C misdemeanor punishable by a $50 fine to a Class B misdemeanor punishable by a $500 fine. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to littering.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Charlie Baum [R] |
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Torrey Harris [D] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] |
Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] |
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] |
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] | Rep. Iris Rudder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 899 | |
2022-04-07 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/22 |
2022-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-04 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2070 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022