TN HB2419 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a liquor-by-the-drink licensee closing a licensed establishment to provide written notice to the alcoholic beverage commission 14 days rather than 10 days in advance of selling or transferring the licensee's inventory to another licensee. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, Chapter 4, relative to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Mannis [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to TACIR Calendar |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2022-03-02 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2262 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-31 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.