TN HB2414 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes the deadline for a person to register to vote from 30 days before an election to 15 days before an election. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2024-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2347 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback