TN HB2414 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Pr. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Pr. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, establishes Healthcare Facilities Board as successor entity to Board of Hospital Directors. - Amends Chapter 94 of the Private Acts of 1967; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, establishes Healthcare Facilities Board as successor entity to Board of Hospital Directors. - Amends Chapter 94 of the Private Acts of 1967; as amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Pr. Ch. 36 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-02-22 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-02-22 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-02-18 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-02-17 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-02-17 | Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-17 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-06-17 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-06-17 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-06-17 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2009-06-17 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/17/09 | |
2009-06-16 | P2C held on desk. | |
2009-06-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-06-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2380 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-11 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 36
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2414&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2414.pdf |