TN HB2412 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that notification may be published in a newspaper of general circulation if postal addresses of certain parties cannot be ascertained in conservatorship proceedings; specifies that certain examination reports in conservatorship proceedings are confidential and not open for inspection by the public. - Amends TCA Title 34.
Title
As introduced, specifies that notification may be published in a newspaper of general circulation if postal addresses of certain parties cannot be ascertained in conservatorship proceedings; specifies that certain examination reports in conservatorship proceedings are confidential and not open for inspection by the public. - Amends TCA Title 34.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2795 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee