TN HB2410 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-06 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a school to comply with the obligation to report suspected child abuse or neglect in order for the school to qualify as a school in which a student may be enrolled to satisfy school attendance requirements; specifies that certain training and reporting requirements apply to nonpublic schools; prohibits persons who knowingly fail to comply, or who knowingly prevent compliance, with the obligation to report suspected child abuse or neglect from serving as a teacher or in any position requiring proximity to children in certain settings; adds nonpublic schools to the entities required to investigate persons applying for or holding a position requiring proximity to school children. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 49, relative to child abuse.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-06HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2024-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration
2024-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2024-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2267 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-06 - Failed in Senate Education Committee / no second

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback