TN HB2410 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for reckless endangerment by discharging a firearm from within a motor vehicle from a Class E felony to a Class C felony. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-103.
Title
As introduced, increases the penalty for reckless endangerment by discharging a firearm from within a motor vehicle from a Class E felony to a Class C felony. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-103.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2305 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee