TN HB2408 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a court from requiring an appearance bond for any juvenile released after being taking into custody for a delinquent or unruly act. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a court from requiring an appearance bond for any juvenile released after being taking into custody for a delinquent or unruly act. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2307 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee