TN HB2407 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, disallows industrial machinery franchise and excise tax credit if taxpayer's investment in industrial machinery results in a net loss of full-time employees for the taxpayer. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, disallows industrial machinery franchise and excise tax credit if taxpayer's investment in industrial machinery results in a net loss of full-time employees for the taxpayer. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2613 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-27 - Failed in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee