TN HB2405 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Failed in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a task force of the general assembly to study the effects of overturning the FCC's net neutrality rules. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 12; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a task force of the general assembly to study the effects of overturning the FCC's net neutrality rules. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 12; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseFailed in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/13/2018
2018-03-06HouseAction Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/13/2018
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2018-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2018-02-05HouseP1C.
2018-02-01HouseIntro.
2018-02-01HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2449 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback