TN HB2405 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Pr. Ch. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, subject to local approval, authorizes a hotel/motel tax in Clay County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, subject to local approval, authorizes a hotel/motel tax in Clay County.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-17 Pr. Ch. 25
2009-06-09 Signed by Governor.
2009-06-05 Transmitted to Governor for his action.
2009-06-04 Signed by S. Speaker
2009-06-03 Signed by H. Speaker
2009-06-02 Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2009-06-02 Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0
2009-06-02 S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
2009-06-02 Rcvd. from H., P1C.
2009-06-02 S. Subst. HB for comp. SB.
2009-05-28 Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2009-05-28 Passed H., Ayes 83, Nays 8, PNV 3
2009-05-26 H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/28/09
2009-05-26 Objected to on Consent Calendar.
2009-05-21 H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/26/09
2009-05-18 P2C held on desk.
2009-05-14 Intro., P1C.
2009-05-12 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2372 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 25

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback