TN HB2404 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-20 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires rather than authorizes a sentencing judge to order a person committing domestic assault to complete a drug or alcohol treatment program or an available counseling program as part of the sentence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires rather than authorizes a sentencing judge to order a person committing domestic assault to complete a drug or alcohol treatment program or an available counseling program as part of the sentence. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2402 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee