TN HB2402 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner to prepare a report outlining existing laws that establish fair debt buying practices in this state, if any, and transmit the report electronically to the governor and each member of the general assembly no later than December 31, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner to prepare a report outlining existing laws that establish fair debt buying practices in this state, if any, and transmit the report electronically to the governor and each member of the general assembly no later than December 31, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Held on desk. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Action def. in Insurance and Banking Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2302 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee