TN HB2396 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes nonprofit dental service plan corporations that only provide dental plans and policies in this state to provide plans for vision services as well as dental services under certain conditions. - Amends amend TCA Title 56.
Title
As enacted, authorizes nonprofit dental service plan corporations that only provide dental plans and policies in this state to provide plans for vision services as well as dental services under certain conditions. - Amends amend TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Pub. Ch. 644 | |
2018-04-09 | Effective date(s) 04/02/2018 | |
2018-04-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-16 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0703) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0719) |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2659 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 644