TN HB2389 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 864
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits law enforcement officers of this state and its political subdivisions from enforcing provisions of international law and treaties that limit gun rights under Article I, Section 26 of the state constitution. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits law enforcement officers of this state and its political subdivisions from enforcing provisions of international law and treaties that limit gun rights under Article I, Section 26 of the state constitution. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-02 Pub. Ch. 864
2016-05-02 Effective date(s) 04/19/2016
2016-04-19 Signed by Governor.
2016-04-12HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2016-04-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-04-08HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2016-04-07SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 0, PNV 2
2016-04-07SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2016-03-30SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2016-03-29HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2016-03-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-28HousePassed H., Ayes 88, Nays 2, PNV 2
2016-03-24HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2016
2016-03-23HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016
2016-03-22HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2016-03-17HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-16HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/22/2016
2016-03-16HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2016-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
2016-02-24HouseFailed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
2016-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2016
2016-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2016-01-27HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2016-01-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-25HouseP1C.
2016-01-21HouseIntro.
2016-01-21HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2395 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 864

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback