TN HB2387 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Pub. Ch. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the annual report the division of consumer affairs is required to make to the general assembly on the activities of the division. - Amends TCA Title 47.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the annual report the division of consumer affairs is required to make to the general assembly on the activities of the division. - Amends TCA Title 47.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 684 | |
2018-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2018 | |
2018-04-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0754) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-03-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 1, PNV 2 |
2018-03-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0816) |
2018-03-15 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0805) |
2018-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2358 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 684