TN HB2386 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises law regarding venue for review of contested cases under the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, revises law regarding venue for review of contested cases under the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1021 | |
2018-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2603 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1021