TN HB2381 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Meeting Canceled
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds transpotainment to the list of passenger transportation service vehicles for which Davidson and Shelby counties are empowered to regulate. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, adds transpotainment to the list of passenger transportation service vehicles for which Davidson and Shelby counties are empowered to regulate. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10HouseReset on Final cal. of Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-03HouseMeeting Canceled. Reset on Safety & Funding Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee
2020-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee
2020-02-05HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2513 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback