TN HB2380 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal. in Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal. in Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a credit against sales or use taxes for providers of cellular phone services that build cellular towers in certain unserved areas. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 65 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, creates a credit against sales or use taxes for providers of cellular phone services that build cellular towers in certain unserved areas. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 65 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2226 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee