TN HB2379 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the bureau of TennCare from including any drug containing oxycodone on any formulary or preferred drug list maintained for the Medicaid program; requires any drugs containing oxycodone to be removed from the formularies or lists within 90 days of the effective date of this act. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the bureau of TennCare from including any drug containing oxycodone on any formulary or preferred drug list maintained for the Medicaid program; requires any drugs containing oxycodone to be removed from the formularies or lists within 90 days of the effective date of this act. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2112 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee