TN HB2370 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 823
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes an individual, business entity, or government entity to allow the concealed carry of handguns by handgun carry permit holders on the individual's or entity's property while prohibiting other weapons or the open carry of firearms; establishes posting requirements for "concealed firearms by permit only" signage. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1359.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes an individual, business entity, or government entity to allow the concealed carry of handguns by handgun carry permit holders on the individual's or entity's property while prohibiting other weapons or the open carry of firearms; establishes posting requirements for "concealed firearms by permit only" signage. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1359.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04 Pub. Ch. 823
2018-05-04 Effective date(s) 04/24/2018
2018-04-24 Signed by Governor.
2018-04-17HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-04-16SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-12HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-10HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-09HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 74, Nays 18 PNV 1 HB2370
2018-04-05HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/9/2018
2018-04-05SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 0, PNV 1
2018-04-05SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0897)
2018-04-05SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-03-05SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-03-01HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-03-01HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 86, Nays 7, PNV 0
2018-03-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-01HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0725)
2018-02-26HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2018-02-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-22HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/26/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2018
2018-02-20HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-02-14HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/20/2018
2018-02-14HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2018-02-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2018-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2018-02-05HouseP1C.
2018-02-01HouseIntro.
2018-02-01HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2369 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 823

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback