TN HB2369 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates social media platforms as common carriers and requires the entities to obtain certificates of public convenience and necessity from the Tennessee public utilities commission; prescribes fines against social media platforms that deplatform and shadow ban users based on political ideology, viewpoint, or personal animus, or discrimination based on race, creed, color, religion, sex, age, or national origin. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 47 and Title 65.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 47 and Title 65, relative to social media.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2161 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022