TN HB2368 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, repeals the law that allows handgun carry permit holders to transport or store a firearm or firearm ammunition in the permit holder's motor vehicle while on or utilizing a public or private parking area if the firearm or firearm ammunition is kept from ordinary observation. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 49 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, repeals the law that allows handgun carry permit holders to transport or store a firearm or firearm ammunition in the permit holder's motor vehicle while on or utilizing a public or private parking area if the firearm or firearm ammunition is kept from ordinary observation. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 49 and Title 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
2020-06-11HousePlaced behind the budget
2020-06-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/11/2020
2020-06-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020
2020-06-10HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-06-09HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-06-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020
2020-06-02HouseAction def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
2020-05-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020
2020-05-26HouseAction def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/2/2020
2020-05-20HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020
2020-03-18HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-10HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/10/2020
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/3/2020
2020-02-25HouseAction Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/3/2020
2020-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 2/25/2020
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2020-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2020-02-05HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1722 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback