TN HB2366 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits local governing bodies from adopting or continuing in effect any ordinance, resolution, rule, or regulation regarding the exhibition of livestock; specifies that the prohibition does not apply when such enactment is otherwise authorized by state law or is related to reasonable restrictions regarding time, place, and manner consistent with other similar events or the protection of public health, safety, or welfare. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 44.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits local governing bodies from adopting or continuing in effect any ordinance, resolution, rule, or regulation regarding the exhibition of livestock; specifies that the prohibition does not apply when such enactment is otherwise authorized by state law or is related to reasonable restrictions regarding time, place, and manner consistent with other similar events or the protection of public health, safety, or welfare. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 44.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 742
2020-06-09HouseComp. SB subst.
2020-06-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020
2020-06-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020
2020-06-02HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-05-27HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/2/2020
2020-03-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2020
2020-03-11HouseMeeeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee cal. for 3/17/20
2020-03-04HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/10/2020
2020-03-03HouseMeeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee cal. for 3/10/20
2020-02-26HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/3/2020
2020-02-25HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/25/2020
2020-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2020-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2020-02-05HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2378 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 742

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback