TN HB2365 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the 25 percent tuition discount at state institutions of higher education for children under 24 years of age whose parents are full-time certified teachers in any Tennessee public school to children under 24 years of age whose parents are full-time educational employees in any Tennessee public school. - Amends TCA Section 49-7-119.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 49-7-119, relative to tuition discounts.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | No Action Taken |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2856 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee