TN HB2360 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 635
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 635
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that licensure renewals for heath facilities licenses be due on the anniversary date of the license instead of June 30 of each year; authorizes, during transition period, issuance of renewals for terms of no less than five months and no more than 18 months or year to year. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, requires that licensure renewals for heath facilities licenses be due on the anniversary date of the license instead of June 30 of each year; authorizes, during transition period, issuance of renewals for terms of no less than five months and no more than 18 months or year to year. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH & HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HHR SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health & Human Resources Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH & HUMAN RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-24 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HHR SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health & Human Resources Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 635 | |
2012-03-15 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-03-08 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2012 | |
2012-02-28 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 2/22/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-02-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/15/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on cal. Health & Human Resources Committee for 2/1/2012 | |
2012-01-24 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Placed on s/c cal HHR Subcommittee for 1/24/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to s/c HHR Subcommittee | |
2012-01-13 | P2C, ref. to Health & Human Resources Committee--Gov. Op. for review | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2222 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-04 - Pub. Ch. 635