TN HB2358 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 847
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, designates The Church @ 117 in Coffee County and Drafts and Watercrafts in Franklin County as premier type tourist resorts for purposes of on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, designates The Church @ 117 in Coffee County and Drafts and Watercrafts in Franklin County as premier type tourist resorts for purposes of on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 847
2018-04-09HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-04-05HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018
2018-04-04HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018
2018-03-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018
2018-03-21HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-13HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2018
2018-03-07HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2018-03-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2018-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2018-02-05HouseP1C.
2018-02-01HouseIntro.
2018-02-01HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2377 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 847

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback