TN HB2358 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends from 10 days to 14 days the period by which a health club is required to notify the commissioner of commerce and insurance of any change in ownership or the sale of the health club. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends from 10 days to 14 days the period by which a health club is required to notify the commissioner of commerce and insurance of any change in ownership or the sale of the health club. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2016-01-27HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2016-01-25HouseP1C.
2016-01-21HouseIntro.
2016-01-21HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2433 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback