TN HB2358 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from $75,000 to $150,000 the dollar amount of leases that require approval by the attorney general and state building commission; requires the state architect to post certain information on the state architect's web site, with regard to any proposed lease of property by or to the state that is less than five years or costs less than $150,000 per year or such other amount as determined by the state building commission. - Amends TCA Section 12-2-115.
Title
As enacted, increases from $75,000 to $150,000 the dollar amount of leases that require approval by the attorney general and state building commission; requires the state architect to post certain information on the state architect's web site, with regard to any proposed lease of property by or to the state that is less than five years or costs less than $150,000 per year or such other amount as determined by the state building commission. - Amends TCA Section 12-2-115.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-01-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State & Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554 | |
2012-03-01 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2012-02-16 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/1/2012 | |
2012-02-16 | Reset on Reg cal. for 3/1/12 | |
2012-02-14 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/16/2012 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-02-07 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 2/7/2012 | |
2012-01-31 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 2/7/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 1/31/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 1/25/2012 | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee | |
2012-01-13 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2220 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-22 - Pub. Ch. 554