TN HB2348 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 901
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 901
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a prescriber to provide certain information prior to prescribing more than a three-day supply of an opioid or an opioid dosage that exceeds a total of a 180 morphine milligram equivalent dose to a woman of childbearing age. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, requires a prescriber to provide certain information prior to prescribing more than a three-day supply of an opioid or an opioid dosage that exceeds a total of a 180 morphine milligram equivalent dose to a woman of childbearing age. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 901 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0716) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0731) |
2018-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1187) |
2018-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0785) |
2018-04-16 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Held on desk. |
2018-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-26 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2018-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-01-31 | House | Sponsor change. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2674 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 901