TN HB2346 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires certain utilities to prepare and implement a cyber security plan to provide for the protection of the utility's facilities from unauthorized use, alteration, ransom, or destruction of electronic data and imposes certain requirements on the comptroller in regard to such plans; requires public utilities that provide electric, water, wastewater, or natural gas services to prepare and implement a cyber security plan and imposes certain requirements on the public utilities commission in regard to such plans. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 64; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7; Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 64; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to utilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1111 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action def. in Commerce Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2022-02-15 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2282 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022