TN HB2342 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Pub. Ch. 1084
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Pub. Ch. 1084
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that 10 years' experience as a wildlife officer may be substituted for the requirement of a bachelor's degree for a person to qualify for the position of wildlife officer with the wildlife resources agency. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 70.
Title
As enacted, specifies that 10 years' experience as a wildlife officer may be substituted for the requirement of a bachelor's degree for a person to qualify for the position of wildlife officer with the wildlife resources agency. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Pub. Ch. 1084 | |
2016-05-24 | Effective date(s) 05/20/2016 | |
2016-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-05-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 3, PNV 1 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2016-03-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016 |
2016-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1463 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1084