TN HB2339 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases wages and salaries of preferred service employees of the department by 15 percent. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 6 and Title 41.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 6 and Title 41, relative to wages and salaries of department of correction employees.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2345 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee