TN HB2339 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pr. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pr. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, clarifies that the proceeds from the hotel/motel taxes in Obion County that currently go to Reelfoot Lake Tourism shall now be deposited in the general fund. - Amends Chapter 133 of the Private Acts of 1991.
Title
Subject to local approval, clarifies that the proceeds from the hotel/motel taxes in Obion County that currently go to Reelfoot Lake Tourism shall now be deposited in the general fund. - Amends Chapter 133 of the Private Acts of 1991.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pr. Ch. 42 | |
2018-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 2, PNV 4 |
2018-04-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0941) |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1653 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 42