TN HB2335 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 881
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a healthcare provider who is authorized to prescribe buprenorphine under federal law from prescribing via telehealth a buprenorphine product, as approved by the federal food and drug administration for use in recovery or medication-assisted treatment, unless certain conditions met. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to the prescribing of buprenorphine.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 881 | |
2022-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2240 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022