TN HB2334 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of health to distribute to the local health departments throughout this state rabies vaccines for human patients afflicted by injuries sustained by animals in a manner proportional to the populations served by those local health departments. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of health to distribute to the local health departments throughout this state rabies vaccines for human patients afflicted by injuries sustained by animals in a manner proportional to the populations served by those local health departments. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Public Health Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2881 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Failed in Senate Health and Welfare Committee