TN HB2333 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-19 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the possession, manufacture, transport, repair, or sale of a switch or auto sear device designed, made, or adapted for the purpose of converting a weapon to shoot automatically more than one shot, without manual reloading, by a single function of the trigger, and a firearm built from a weapon parts kit, including a frame or receiver parts kit, and not marked with a serial number, unless certain exceptions apply. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2453 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-05 - Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee