TN HB2333 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 804
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 804
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, waives the lifetime handgun carry permit fees for retired law enforcement officers who served for at least 10 years, rather than former law enforcement officers who served for at least 10 years. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Title
As enacted, waives the lifetime handgun carry permit fees for retired law enforcement officers who served for at least 10 years, rather than former law enforcement officers who served for at least 10 years. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 804 | |
2020-06-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-05-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2737 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 804