TN HB2331 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 777
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 777
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires LEAs to report certain information to the department of education regarding use of corporal punishment. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, requires LEAs to report certain information to the department of education regarding use of corporal punishment. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 777 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 04/19/2018 | |
2018-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-05 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0883) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 80, Nays 1, PNV 3 |
2018-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0986) |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1947 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 777