TN HB2328 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts "Eli's Law," which establishes procedures for placing newborns in the department's custody if the parent has a dependent or neglected child currently in the department's custody. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
As introduced, enacts "Eli's Law," which establishes procedures for placing newborns in the department's custody if the parent has a dependent or neglected child currently in the department's custody. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2109 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee