TN HB2322 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain health benefit plans to include coverage for treatment services required for and related to treatment of an acquired brain injury; prohibits health benefit plans from imposing certain limitations on the number of days of acute care, post-acute care, and covered inpatient care for acquired brain injuries; makes additional changes related to such coverage. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 56.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 56, relative to health insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2373 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee