TN HB2315 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 66-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 973
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits state and local governmental entities and officials from adopting sanctuary policies; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits state and local governmental entities and officials from adopting sanctuary policies; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 8; Title 9; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 55 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 7 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 58 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 6 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Pub. Ch. 973
2018-05-23 Effective date(s) 01/01/2019
2018-05-21 Returned by Governor without signature.
2018-05-10HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-05-09SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-05-02HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-25SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 5
2018-04-25SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - SA1156)
2018-04-25SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - SA1077)
2018-04-25SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA1076)
2018-04-25SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1030)
2018-04-25SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0870)
2018-04-25SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-04-25SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-04-25HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-25HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 64, Nays 23, PNV 0
2018-04-25HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 8 - HA1301)
2018-04-25HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 7 - HA1299)
2018-04-25HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 6 - HA1298)
2018-04-25HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 5 - HA1292)
2018-04-25HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 4 - HA1291)
2018-04-25HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1182)
2018-04-25HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1181)
2018-04-25HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1180)
2018-04-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-24HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2018
2018-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2018
2018-04-24HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseDef. to TACIR in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-19HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/23/2018
2018-04-12HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-11HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-11HouseReset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-11HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018
2018-04-11HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018
2018-04-10HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-04-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-04HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 4/10/2018
2018-04-04HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-03HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-03HouseAction def. in State Government Committee to Next Calendar
2018-03-28HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 4/3/2018
2018-03-28HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2018-03-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-26HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-21HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018
2018-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/28/2018
2018-03-19HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-02-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-26HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2018-02-05HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2018-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2332 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 973

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2315&ga=110
Texthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HB2315.pdf
Texthttp://publications.tnsosfiles.com/acts/110/pub/pc0973.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1180.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1181.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1182.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1291.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1292.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1298.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1299.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Amend/HA1301.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/HB2315.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM2543.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM3092.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM3231.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM3286.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Fiscal/FM3358.pdf
Roll Callhttp://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2315&ga=110

Bill Comments

feedback